+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (77)
On January 3, 2017 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 8 Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On November 28, 2016 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 8 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On November 23, 2016 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 8 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis
- House Floor Amendment No. 8 Referred to Rules Committee
On November 22, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000
On June 30, 2016 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On June 3, 2016 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 7 Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed as Amended
On May 31, 2016 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 7 Correctional Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Kathleen Willis
- House Floor Amendment No. 7 Judicial Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Kathleen Willis
- House Floor Amendment No. 7 Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Kathleen Willis
- House Floor Amendment No. 7 Home Rule Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Kathleen Willis
- House Floor Amendment No. 7 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 7 Balanced Budget Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Kathleen Willis
- House Floor Amendment No. 7 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Kathleen Willis
- House Floor Amendment No. 7 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Kathleen Willis
- House Floor Amendment No. 7 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Kathleen Willis
- House Floor Amendment No. 7 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis
- House Floor Amendment No. 7 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 7 Pension Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Kathleen Willis
- House Floor Amendment No. 7 Judicial Note Filed as Amended
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2016
- House Floor Amendment No. 7 Correctional Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 7 State Debt Impact Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Kathleen Willis
- House Floor Amendment No. 7 Home Rule Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 7 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 7 Balanced Budget Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 7 Pension Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 7 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 7 State Debt Impact Note Filed as Amended
On May 30, 2016 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 6 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
On May 27, 2016 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Withdrawn by Rep. Kathleen Willis
- House Floor Amendment No. 5 Withdrawn by Rep. Kathleen Willis
- House Floor Amendment No. 6 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Ed Sullivan
- House Floor Amendment No. 6 Correctional Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Ed Sullivan
- House Floor Amendment No. 6 Home Rule Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Ed Sullivan
- House Floor Amendment No. 6 Lost 043-055-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 6 Judicial Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Ed Sullivan
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 6 Correctional Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 6 Home Rule Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 6 Judicial Note Filed as Amended
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2016
On May 26, 2016 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis
- House Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 5 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 6 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis
- House Floor Amendment No. 6 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 6 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 6 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 009-006-000
On May 25, 2016 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On May 24, 2016 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis
On May 23, 2016 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis
On May 18, 2016 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 009-006-000
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis
On May 12, 2016 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kathleen Willis
On May 11, 2016 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2016
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-001-000
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 30, 2015
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Adopted Amendments (8)
+ − Statute Amended
- 415 ILCS 5/21 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 1021
+ − Votes (4)
May 27, 2016: HFA0006 - Amendment
May 26, 2016: HFA0006 - Judiciary - Criminal
May 17, 2016: HFA0001 - Judiciary - Criminal
April 14, 2015: HB1016 - Executive - Apr 14, 2015
+ − Sponsors (34)
Type:
Primary Sponsor