+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (49)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0054
- Effective Date January 1, 2016
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2015
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2015
- Do Pass Public Health; 007-000-000
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Emil Jones, III
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Emil Jones, III
- Assigned to Public Health
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 014-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Ed Sullivan
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Ed Sullivan
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. Ed Sullivan
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. Ed Sullivan
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 008-005-000
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 30, 2015
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
House Amendment 003
Replaces everything after the enacting clause with the bill as amended by House Amendment No. 2. Makes the following changes: defines "opt-in testing" and "opt-out testing". Provides that consent for opt-out HIV testing may be incorporated into a patient's general consent for medical care on the same basis as other testing. With respect to informed consent, replaces references to "health care facilities or providers" with "a health care provider, health care professional, or health facility". Makes formatting changes.
House Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the State Finance Act and the African-American HIV/AIDS Response Act. Extends the date of repeal of the African-American HIV/AIDS Response Fund from July 1, 2016 to July 1, 2026. Amends the AIDS Confidentiality Act. Makes changes to the definitions of "health care professional" and "informed consent". Defines "pre-test information". Provides that a subject's or a subject's legally authorized representative's verbal or written consent, or declination of opt-out HIV testing, must be documented by the health facility or provider in the general consent for medical care, a separate consent form, or elsewhere in the medical record. Makes other changes concerning informed consent and pre-test information. Makes other changes.
+ − Statutes Amended (7)
- 410 ILCS 50/1 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 5401
- 30 ILCS 105/5.666 -
- 410 ILCS 303/27 -
- 410 ILCS 305/3 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 7303
- 410 ILCS 305/4 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 7304
- 410 ILCS 305/9 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 7309
- 410 ILCS 305/5 rep. -