+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 13, 2009 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- Remains in Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
- Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 001-002-000; Lost
On February 18, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On February 10, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Raymond Poe
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 730 ILCS 150/2 - from Ch. 38, par. 222
- 730 ILCS 150/3 -
- 730 ILCS 150/7 - from Ch. 38, par. 227