+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On June 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Appointment Confirmed
- Do Advise and Consent Passed 055-000-000
- Motion Prevailed
- Motion Filed Appointment Messages Be Acted on Together ** Sen. Antonio Muñoz; AMs 990249, 990250, 990251, 990299, 990540 (Secure Choice Savings Board) AMs 990254 and 990255 (Amusement Ride & Attraction Safety Board) AM 990287 (State Medical Disciplinary Board) AMs 990289 and 990290 (Workforce Investment Board) AMs 990318, 990319, 990320, 990321, 990322, 990323 and 990324 (Labor Advisory Board) AMs 990352, 990363, 990425 (State Banking Board of Illinois)
On May 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Executive Appointments May 24, 2016
- Recommends Do Advise and Consent Executive Appointments; 004-000-001
On November 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive Appointments
On August 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Received by the Senate Sen. Antonio Muñoz
+ − Vote
May 23, 2016: AM990323 - Executive Appointments
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor