+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Appointment Confirmed
- Do Advise and Consent Passed 042-000-000
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Executive Appointments January 28, 2016
- Recommends Do Advise and Consent Executive Appointments; 005-000-001
On November 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive Appointments
On August 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Received by the Senate Sen. Antonio Muñoz
+ − Votes (2)
March 1, 2016: AM990285
January 13, 2016: AM990285 - Executive Appointments - Jan 13, 2016
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor