+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Appointment Confirmed
- Do Advise and Consent Passed 055-000-000
- Motion Prevailed
- Motion Filed Appointment Messages Be Acted on Together ** Sen. Antonio Muñoz; AMs 990156, 990157,990158, 990159, 990160, 990161, 990457, 990458, 990459, 990460, 990461, 990462 (Workers' Compensation Advisory Board) AMs 990162, 990163, 990164 (Enterprise Zone Board) AM 990176 (Illinois Medical Licensing Board) AM 990185 (Illinois Finance Authority) AMs 990195, 990278, 990284 (Illinois Community College Board) AM 990196 (Health Facilities and Services Review Board) AMs 990198, 990273, 990274, 990275, 990276, 990296, 990329, 990339, 990355 (Workforce Investment Board) AMs 990206, 990256 (Illinois Torture Inquiry & Relief Commission) AMs 990212, 990345 (Illinois Housing Development Authority) AM 990214 (Illinois Student Assistance Commission) AM 990242 (Public Administrator & Public Guardian for Cumberland County) AM 990243 (Public Administrator & Public Guardian for Shelby County) AMs 990304, 990305, 990306, and 990326 (State Board of Health) AM 990342 (Trustee of the Board of Trustees of Northern Illinois University) AM 990343 (Public Administrator & Public Guardian for Clinton County) AM 990344 (Public Administrator & Public Guardian for Marion County) AM 990358 (Joliet Regional Port District Board)
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Executive Appointments January 28, 2016
- Recommends Do Advise and Consent Executive Appointments; 005-000-001
On November 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive Appointments
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Received by the Senate Sen. Antonio Muñoz
+ − Votes (2)
April 13, 2016: AM990243
January 13, 2016: AM990243 - Executive Appointments - Jan 13, 2016
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor