+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Appt Confirmed, Pursuant Article V, Sect 9(a) of the ILL Constitution Executive Appointments
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Executive Appointments January 28, 2016
- Recommends Do Advise and Consent Executive Appointments; 005-000-001
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive Appointments
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Received by the Senate Sen. Antonio Muñoz
+ − Vote
January 13, 2016: AM990207 - Executive Appointments - Jan 13, 2016
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor