+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Appointment Confirmed
- Do Advise and Consent Passed 048-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of Executive Appointments
- Recommends Do Advise and Consent Executive Appointments; 005-000-000
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive Appointments
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Waive Posting Notice
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Received by the Senate Sen. Antonio Muñoz
+ − Votes (2)
April 30, 2015: AM990177 - Thursday, April 30, 2015
April 30, 2015: AM990177 - Executive Appointments - Apr 30, 2015
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor