+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Appointment Confirmed
- Do Advise and Consent Passed 048-000-000
On May 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Executive Appointments May 26, 2015
- Recommends Do Advise and Consent Executive Appointments; 004-000-000
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive Appointments
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Supersedes AM 990043 of the 99th General Assembly
- Referred to Assignments
- Received by the Senate Sen. Antonio Muñoz
+ − Votes (2)
January 13, 2016: AM990144 - Wednesday, January 13, 2016
May 25, 2015: AM990144 - Executive Appointments - May 25, 2015
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor