+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Appointment Confirmed
- Do Advise and Consent Passed 050-000-002
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Executive Appointments February 17, 2015
- Recommends Do Advise and Consent Executive Appointments; 006-000-000
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive Appointments
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Received by the Senate Sen. Antonio Muñoz
+ − Votes (2)
February 17, 2015: AM990007 - Tuesday, February 17, 2015
February 10, 2015: AM990007 - Executive Appointments - Feb 10, 2015
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor