+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Appointment Confirmed
- Do Advise and Consent Passed 046-000-004
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Executive Appointments February 17, 2015
- Recommends Do Advise and Consent Executive Appointments; 006-000-000
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive Appointments
On January 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments; on 01/13/2015 - Due to Sine Die of the 98th General Assembly
- Assigned to Executive Appointments; on 02/11/2014
- Referred to Assignments; on 01/21/2014
- Received by the Senate Sen. Antonio Muñoz; on 01/21/2014
- ** Appointment Message Carried Over from Previous General Assembly **
+ − Votes (2)
February 17, 2015: AM980423 - Tuesday, February 17, 2015
February 10, 2015: AM980423 - Executive Appointments - Feb 10, 2015
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor