+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Appointment Confirmed
- Do Advise and Consent Passed 053-000-002
- Motion Prevailed
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 10-1(c), move to compile the following AM's; AM 92 (Board of Trustees of Western Illinois University) AM 263 (State Banking Board of Illinois) AM 264 (Medical Licensing Board) AMs 318, 377 (Illinois Workforce Investment Board) AM 336 (Public Guardian of DuPage County) AMs 340, 341 (Abraham Lincoln Presidential Library Advisory Board) AM 342 ( Mid-Illinois Medical District Commission) AM 355 ( Illinois Comprehensive Health Insurance Board) AMs 365, 366 (Workers' Compensation Medical Fee Advisory Board)
- Motion Filed Appointment Messages Be Acted on Together ** Sen. Antonio Muñoz; AM 92 (Board of Trustees of Western Illinois University) AM 263 (State Banking Board of Illinois) AM 264 (Medical Licensing Board) AMs 318, 377 (Illinois Workforce Investment Board) AM 336 (Public Guardian of DuPage County) AMs 340, 341 (Abraham Lincoln Presidential Library Advisory Board) AM 342 ( Mid-Illinois Medical District Commission) AM 355 ( Illinois Comprehensive Health Insurance Board) AMs 365, 366 (Workers' Compensation Medical Fee Advisory Board)
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Executive Appointments February 25, 2014
- Recommends Do Advise and Consent Executive Appointments; 011-000-000
On October 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive Appointments
On October 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Received by the Senate Sen. Antonio Muñoz
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor