+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Appointment Confirmed
- Do Advise and Consent Passed 049-000-000
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Executive Appointments February 25, 2014
- Recommends Do Advise and Consent Executive Appointments; 011-000-000
On October 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive Appointments
On October 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Received by the Senate Sen. Antonio Muñoz
+ − Vote
February 27, 2014: AM0308 - Thursday, February 27, 2014
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor