+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On November 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Appointment Confirmed
- Do Advise and Consent Passed 056-000-000
- Motion Prevailed
On November 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Motion Filed Appointment Messages Be Acted on Together ** Sen. Antonio Muñoz; AM 240, 241, 242 (Affordable Housing Advisory Commission) AM 221 (Board of the Illinois State Museum) AM 354 (Central Illinois Economic Development Authority) AM 316 (Board of Trustees of Chicago State University) AM 279, 280 (Children and Family Services Advisory Council) AM 265 (East St. Louis Financial Advisory Authority) AM 236, 237 (Financial Reporting Standards Board) AM 275 (Havana Regional Port District Board) AM 326, 327, 328 (Health Facilities and Services Review Board) AM 234, 235 (Historic Preservation Agency Board of Trustees) AM 246, 247, 248 (Illinois Health Information Exchange Authority) AM 311, 312, 313, 314 (Illinois Housing Development Authority) AM 330 ( Illinois Student Assistance Commission) AM 272, 273, 274, 358 (Kaskaskia Regional Port District Board) AM 315 (Lottery Control Board) AM 244 (Medical Licensing Board) AM 278 (Public Guardian & Public Administrator for Bond County) AM 292 (Public Guardian & Public Administrator for Clay County) AM 293 ((Public Guardian & Public Administrator for Edgar County) AM 261 (Public Guardian & Public Administrator for Ford County) AM 286 (Public Guardian & Public Administrator for Johnson County) AM 332 (Public Guardian & Public Administrator for Macon County) AM 277 (Public Guardian & Public Administrator for Macoupin County) AM 331 (Public Guardian & Public Administrator for Marshall County) AM 259 (Public Guardian & Public Administrator for Peoria County) AM 285 (Public Guardian & Public Administrator for Pope County) AM 258 (Public Guardian & Public Administrator for Rock Island County) AM 260 (Public Guardian & Public Administrator for Saline County) AM 262 (Public Guardian & Public Administrator for Shelby County) AM 173 (Public Guardian & Public Administrator for Williamson County) AM 276, 324 (Southwest Regional Port District Board) AM 267, 329 (State Board of Health) AM 189 (Tri-County River Valley Development Authority Board) AM 325 (Western Illinois Economic Devlopment Authority)
- Placed on Calendar Order of Executive Appointments November 6, 2013
- Recommends Do Advise and Consent Executive Appointments; 010-000-000
On October 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive Appointments
On June 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Received by the Senate Sen. Antonio Muñoz
+ − Vote
November 7, 2013: AM0246 - Thursday, November 07, 2013
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor