+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On October 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Appointment Confirmed
- Do Advise and Consent Passed 049-000-006
- Motion Prevailed
- Motion Filed Appointment Messages Be Acted on Together ** Sen. Antonio Muñoz; AM 62 (Department of Labor Advisory Board) AM 71 (Board of Trustees of Governor State University) AM 75 (Illinois Finance Authority) AM 76 and AM 78 (Health Information Exchange Authority) AM 79, AM 80 and AM 174 (Illinois Housing Development Authority) AM 81 (Public Guardian & Public Administrator for Adams County) AM 82 ( Public Guardian & Public Administrator for Brown County) AM 83 ( Public Guardian & Public Administrator for Jackson County) AM 84 ( Public Guardian & Public Administrator for for Stephenson County) AM 88, AM 89 and AM 90 (Illiois Torture Inquiry & Relief Commission) AM 98 (Joliet Regional Port District Board) AM 105,AM 106, AM 107 (Financial Reporting Standards Board) AM 108 ( Public Guardian & Public Administrator for Whiteside County) AM 109 ( Public Guardian & Public Administrator for Kendall County) AM 111 ( Public Guardian & Public Administrator for Franklin County) AM 170 (Will County Metropolitan Exposition & Auditorium Authority Board) AM 171 (Central Midwest Interstate Low-Level Radioactive Waste Commission) AM 175 and AM 186 (Guardianship & Advocacy Commission) AM 180 (Board of Trustees of Eastern Illinois University) AM 193 (State Medical Disciplinary Board) AM 194 (Abraham Lincoln Presidential Library Advisory Board) AM 197 and AM 198 (Illinois Workforce Investment Board) AM 200 ( Public Guardian & Public Administrator for Carroll County) AM 201 and AM 202 (Board of Trustees of Chicago State University) AM 205, AM 206, AM 207, AM 208, AM 209, AM 210, AM 211, AM 212, AM 213, AM 214 and AM 215 (Employment Security Advisory Board) AM 216 (Advisory Council on Spinal Cord and Head Injuries) AM 223, AM 238 and AM 239 (Illinois Comprehensive Health Insurance Plan Board) AM 224, AM 225, AM 226, AM 227, AM 228, AM 229, AM 250, AM 251, AM 252, AM 253, AM 254 and AM 255 (Children and Family Services Advisory Council)
On October 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Executive Appointments October 22, 2013
- Recommends Do Advise and Consent Executive Appointments; 010-000-001
On October 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive Appointments
On June 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Received by the Senate Sen. Antonio Muñoz
+ − Vote
October 23, 2013: AM0239 - Wednesday, October 23, 2013
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor