+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On October 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Appointment Confirmed
- Do Advise and Consent Passed 048-005-000
On October 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Executive Appointments October 22, 2013
- Recommends Do Advise and Consent Executive Appointments; 010-000-001
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive Appointments
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Received by the Senate Sen. Antonio Muñoz
+ − Vote
October 23, 2013: AM0155 - Wednesday, October 23, 2013
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor