+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Appointment Confirmed
- Do Consent Passed 051-000-000
- Motion Prevailed
- Motion Filed Appointment Messages Be Acted on Together ** Sen. Laura M. Murphy; AMs 1010507,1010508, 1010509,1010510, 1010511,1010512,1010513,1010514,1010515,1010516 (Board of Illinois State Museum Members) AM 1010517 (Illinois Student Assistance Commission Member) AMs 1010533,1010534 (Illinois Community College Board Member) AM 1010538 (Metropolitan Pier and Expo Authority Member) AM 1010541 (Teachers' Retirement System Board of Trustees) AMs 1010542,1010543,1010544,1010560,1010576,1010578 (Illinois Finance Authority Member) AMs 1010553, 1010561 (Kaskaskia Regional Port District Board Members) AM 1010567 (Illinois State Board of Investments Member) AMs 1010569, 1010593 (Health Facilities and Services Board Member) AMs1010582, 1010585 (Guardian and Advocacy Commission Member) AM1010584 (Abraham Lincoln Presidential Library and Museum Board of Trustees Member) AMs1010597,1010598 (Firefighters' Pension Investment Fund Permanent Trustee) AM1010599 (Police Officers' Pension Investment Fund Permanent Trustee) AM1010602 (Committee for Agricultural Education Member) AM1010575 (Medical Licensing Board) AM1010583 (Illinois State Medical Disciplinary Board) AMs1010559, 1010587,1010588,1010589,1010590,1010596 (State Board of Health)
On October 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Executive Appointments October 27, 2021
- Recommends Do Consent Executive Appointments; 006-000-000
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive Appointments; on 01/10/2021 - and on 01/13/2021, Due to Sine Die of the 101st General Assembly
- Received by the Senate Sen. Antonio Muñoz; on 01/10/2021
- ** Appointment Message Carried Over from Previous General Assembly **
+ − Votes (2)
February 22, 2022: AM1010514 - Motion
October 26, 2021: AM1010514 - Executive Appointments
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor