+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Appointment Confirmed
- Do Consent Passed 055-000-000
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Executive Appointments May 24, 2021
- Recommends Do Consent Executive Appointments; 006-000-000
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive Appointments; on 10/28/2019 - and on 01/13/2021, Due to Sine Die of the 101st General Assembly
- Received by the Senate Sen. Antonio Muñoz; on 10/28/2019
- ** Appointment Message Carried Over from Previous General Assembly **
+ − Votes (2)
May 26, 2021: AM1010304
May 20, 2021: AM1010304 - Executive Appointments
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor