+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Appointment Confirmed
- Do Advise and Consent Passed 055-000-000
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Executive Appointments May 23, 2017
- Recommends Do Advise and Consent Executive Appointments; 007-000-000
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive Appointments
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Received by the Senate Sen. Antonio Muñoz
+ − Votes (2)
May 31, 2017: AM1000113
May 22, 2017: AM1000113 - Executive Appointments
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor