+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Appointment Confirmed
- Do Advise and Consent Passed 054-000-000
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Executive Appointments February 8, 2017
- Recommends Do Advise and Consent Executive Appointments; 007-000-000
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive Appointments
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Received by the Senate Sen. Antonio Muñoz
+ − Votes (2)
February 15, 2017: AM1000014
February 7, 2017: AM1000014 - Executive Appointments
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor