+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On August 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
- Second Reading
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2017
- Do Pass Higher Education; 008-000-000
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Higher Education
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar