+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported delivered to the Secretary of State on 03/24/16
- Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
- Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
- Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read Third Time in Full – ADOPTED – voice voteFloor Sponsor – JordanTitle apvd – to Senate
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 14, 2016
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs
- Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Read in full – ADOPTED – voice voteFloor Sponsor – Buckner-WebbTitle apvd – to House
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported Printed; referred to 10th order; held one legislative day
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing
+ − Sponsors (16)
STATE AFFAIRS COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor