+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported delivered to the Secretary of State on 03/20/14
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
- Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Read Third Time in Full - ADOPTED - voice vote
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 17, 2014
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Read First Time, Filed for Second Reading
- Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read in full - ADOPTED - voice vote
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Printed; referred to 10th order; held one legislative day
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing
+ − Sponsors (28)
STATE AFFAIRS COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor