+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (28)
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported delivered to the Secretary of State on 03/23/16
- Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
On March 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read Third Time in Full – ADOPTED - 68-1-1AYES – Anderson, Anderst, Andrus, Barbieri, Bateman, Bell, Beyeler, Boyle, Burtenshaw, Chaney, Cheatham, Chew, Clow, Collins, Crane, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Dixon, Erpelding, Gannon, Gestrin, Gibbs, Harris, Hartgen, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Jordan, Kauffman, Kerby, King, Kloc, Loertscher, Luker, Malek, McCrostie, McDonald, McMillan, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Moyle, Nate, Nielsen, Nye, Packer, Palmer, Pence, Raybould, Redman, Romrell, Rubel, Rudolph, Rusche, Scott, Shepherd, Sims, Smith, Thompson, Troy, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Wills, Wintrow, Wood, Youngblood, Mr. SpeakerNAYS – BattAbsent – PerryFloor Sponsors - Raybould & BedkeTitle apvd - to Senate
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 14, 2016
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 7, 2016
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 29, 2016
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read First Time, Referred to Resources & Conservation
- Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read in full – ADOPTED - 34-0-1AYES – Anthon, Bair, Bayer, Brackett, Buckner-Webb, Burgoyne, Davis, Den Hartog, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Harris, Heider, Hill, Johnson, Jordan, Keough, Lacey, Lakey, Lee, Martin, McKenzie, Mortimer, Nonini, Nuxoll, Patrick, Rice, Schmidt, Siddoway, Souza, Stennett, Thayn, Vick, Ward-Engelking, WinderNAYS – NoneAbsent and excused – LodgeFloor Sponsor - BairTitle apvd - to House
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Retained on calendar
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported Printed; referred to Resources & Environment
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing