+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported delivered to the Secretary of State on 04/09/15
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
- Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Title apvd - to Senate
- Rules Suspended: Ayes 69 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 1, read three times - ADOPTED - 68-0-2
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs
- Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Title apvd - to House
- Read in full - ADOPTED - voice vote
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Printed; referred to 10th order; held one legislative day
- Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing
+ − Sponsor
STATE AFFAIRS COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor