+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported delivered to the Secretary of State on 03/29/13
On March 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
On March 29, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
- Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Read Third Time in Full - ADOPTED - 69-0-1
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Read First Time, Referred to Environment, Energy, & Technology
- Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read in full - ADOPTED - 34-0-1
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Printed; referred to 10th order; held one legislative day
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing
+ − Sponsor
STATE AFFAIRS COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor