+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- U.C. to be returned to Judiciary, Rules, & Administration Committee
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 30, 2015
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Read First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules, & Administration
- Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Title apvd - to House
- Read in full - ADOPTED - 34-0-1
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Printed; referred to 10th order; held one legislative day
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing
+ − Sponsor
JUDICIARY AND RULES COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor