+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported delivered to the Secretary of State on 02/28/20
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Title apvd - to Senate
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Read Third Time in Full – ADOPTED - 68-0-2
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 24, 2020
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- Read First Time, Referred to Education
- Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Read in full – ADOPTED – voice voteFloor Sponsor – ThaynTitle apvd – to House
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education
On January 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported Printed; referred to 10th order; held one legislative day
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing
+ − Votes (2)
February 24, 2020: lower Vote
- Yeas: 68
- Present/NV: 68
- Absent: 2
February 6, 2020: lower Vote
- Yeas: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
EDUCATION COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor