+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported delivered to the Secretary of State on 03/29/13
On March 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
On March 29, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
- Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Read Third Time in Full - ADOPTED - 63-7-0
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 25, 2013
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs
- Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read in full - ADOPTED - 29-5-1
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Retained on calendar
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Printed; referred to State Affairs
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing
+ − Sponsor
STATE AFFAIRS COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor