+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported delivered to the Secretary of State on 02/21/17
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read Third Time in Full – ADOPTED – voice voteFloor Sponsor – DayleyTitle apvd – to Senate
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Read First Time, Referred to Agricultural Affairs
- Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Read in full – ADOPTED – voice voteFloor Sponsor – RiceTitle apvd – to House
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported Printed; referred to 10th order; held one legislative day
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing
+ − Sponsor
AGRICULTURAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor