+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported delivered to the Secretary of State on 03/30/17
- Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
- Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
- Read Third Time in Full – ADOPTED – voice voteFloor Sponsor – GibbsTitle apvd – to Senate
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 27, 2017
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Read First Time, Referred to Resources & Conservation
- Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Read in full – ADOPTED – voice voteFloor Sponsor – BrackettTitle apvd – to House
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day
- Referred to Resources & Environment
- Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing
+ − Sponsor
STATE AFFAIRS COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor