+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor on 03/31/16 Session Law Chapter 317 Effective: 03/31/2016
On March 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported delivered to Governor at 2:25 p.m. on 03/28/16
- Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
- Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
- Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
- Rules Suspended: Ayes 69 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 1, read three times – PASSED - 53-17-0AYES – Anderson, Anderst, Andrus, Barbieri, Bateman, Batt, Bell, Beyeler, Boyle, Burtenshaw, Chaney, Cheatham, Clow, Collins, Crane, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Gestrin, Gibbs, Harris, Hartgen, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Kauffman, Kerby, Loertscher, Luker, Malek, McDonald, McMillan, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Moyle, Nate, Nielsen, Packer, Palmer, Perry, Raybould, Redman, Romrell, Shepherd, Thompson, Troy, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Wills, Wood, Youngblood, Mr. SpeakerNAYS – Chew, Dixon, Erpelding, Gannon, Jordan, King, Kloc, McCrostie, Nye, Pence, Rubel, Rudolph, Rusche, Scott, Sims, Smith, WintrowAbsent and excused – NoneFloor Sponsor - GibbsTitle apvd - to Senate
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read First Time, Filed for Second Reading
- Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote - Read in full as required) – Read third time in full – PASSED - 29-5-1AYES – Bair, Bayer, Brackett, Davis, Den Hartog, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Harris, Heider, Hill, Johnson, Keough, Lacey, Lakey, Lee, Lodge, Martin, McKenzie, Mortimer, Nonini, Nuxoll, Patrick, Rice, Schmidt, Siddoway, Souza, Thayn, Vick, WinderNAYS – Rohn(Buckner-Webb), Burgoyne, Jordan, Stennett, Ward-EngelkingAbsent and excused – AnthonFloor Sponsor - KeoughTitle apvd - to House
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
- Reported Printed; referred to Finance
- Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing
+ − Sponsor
FINANCE COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor