+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On March 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor on 03/18/20 Session Law Chapter 199 Effective: 07/01/2020
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
- Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
- Reported delivered to Governor at 11:50 a.m. on 03/18/20
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Rules Suspended: Ayes 68 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 2, read in full as required – PASSED - 68-0-2
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On March 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Title apvd - to Senate
- Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
On March 16, 2020 in the House:
- Read First Time, Filed for Second Reading
- Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
- Title apvd - to House
On March 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time in full – PASSED - 35-0-0
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
- Reported Printed; referred to Finance
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing
+ − Votes (2)
March 16, 2020: upper Vote
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 35
March 12, 2020: upper Vote
- Yeas: 68
- Present/NV: 68
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
FINANCE COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor