+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read First Time, Referred to Health & Welfare
- Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time in full – PASSED - 30-4-1AYES – Bair, Bayer, Brackett, Buckner-Webb, Den Hartog, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Harris, Heider, Hill, Jordan, Keough, Lacey, Lee, Lodge, Martin, McKenzie, Mortimer, Nonini, Nuxoll, Patrick, Rice, Schmidt, Siddoway, Souza, Stennett, Thayn, Vick, Ward-Engelking, WinderNAYS – Anthon, Burgoyne, Johnson, LakeyAbsent and excused – DavisFloor Sponsor - GuthrieTitle apvd - to House
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Retained on calendar
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported Printed; referred to Commerce & Human Resources
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing
+ − Sponsor
STATE AFFAIRS COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor