+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor on 03/28/18 Session Law Chapter 345 Effective: 07/01/2018
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported delivered to Governor at 5:26 p.m. on 03/22/18
- Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
- Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
- Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
- Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read First Time, Filed for Second Reading
- Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
- Reported Printed; referred to Finance
- Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing
+ − Vote
March 20, 2018: upper Vote
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 67
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
FINANCE COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor