+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (31)
On March 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor on 03/26/20 Session Law Chapter 317 Effective: 07/01/2020
- Reported delivered to Governor at 3:45 p.m. on 03/19/20
- Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
- Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
On March 19, 2020 in the House:
- Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
On March 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Title apvd - to enrol
- Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote - Read in full as required) – Read third time as amended in the House – PASSED - 27-4-4
- Read second time as amended in the House, filed for Third Reading
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read first time as amended in the House, filed for Second Reading
- Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended
- Senate concurred in House amendments; referred to engrossment
On March 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to 10th Order for possible concurrence
- Returned from House, amended
On March 16, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time as amended in House; Filed for Third Reading
- Rules Suspended: Ayes 69 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 1, read in full as required – PASSED - 55-14-1
On March 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Title apvd - to Senate
On March 13, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time as amended in House; Filed for Second Reading
- Filed for First Reading
- Amendments Referred to the JRA for Printing
- Reported out without recommendation as amended
- Referred to the Committee of the Whole
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- U.C. to be placed on General Orders
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs
- Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Title apvd - to House
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time in full – PASSED - 28-7-0
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported Printed; referred to State Affairs
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing
+ − Votes (2)
February 27, 2020: upper Vote
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 35
February 26, 2020: upper Vote
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 31
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsor
STATE AFFAIRS COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor