+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor on 03/30/16 Session Law Chapter 267 Effective: 07/01/2016
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported delivered to Governor at 10:45 a.m. on 03/24/16
- Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
- Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
- Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read Third Time in Full – PASSED - 68-2-0AYES – Anderson, Anderst, Andrus, Bateman, Batt, Bell, Beyeler, Boyle, Burtenshaw, Chaney, Cheatham, Chew, Clow, Collins, Crane, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Dixon, Erpelding, Gannon, Gestrin, Gibbs, Harris, Hartgen, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Jordan, Kauffman, Kerby, King, Kloc, Loertscher, Luker, Malek, McCrostie, McDonald, McMillan, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Moyle, Nate, Nielsen, Nye, Packer, Palmer, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Redman, Romrell, Rubel, Rudolph, Rusche, Scott, Shepherd, Smith, Thompson, Troy, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Wills, Wintrow, Wood, Youngblood, Mr. SpeakerNAYS – Barbieri, SimsAbsent and excused – NoneFloor Sponsor - GannonTitle apvd - to Senate
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On March 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration
- Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time in full – PASSED - 31-3-1AYES – Anthon, Bair, Bayer, Brackett, Burgoyne, Davis, Den Hartog, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Harris, Heider, Hill, Johnson, Jordan, Keough, Lacey, Lakey, Lee, Lodge, Martin, Mortimer, Nonini, Patrick, Rice, Schmidt, Siddoway, Souza, Stennett, Thayn, Ward-Engelking, WinderNAYS – McKenzie, Nuxoll, VickAbsent and excused – Buckner-WebbFloor Sponsor - AnthonTitle apvd - to House
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Retained on calendar
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported Printed; referred to Judiciary & Rules
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing
+ − Sponsor
JUDICIARY
Type:
Primary Sponsor