+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (28)
On March 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor on 03/26/20 Session Law Chapter 329 Effective: 07/01/2020
- Reported delivered to Governor at 3:45 p.m. on 03/19/20
- Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
- Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
On March 19, 2020 in the House:
- Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
On March 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Title apvd - to enrol
- Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote - Read in full as required) – Read third time as amended in the House – PASSED - 29-2-4
- Read first time as amended in the House, filed for Second Reading
- Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee of the Whole
- Reported out without recommendation as amended
- Amendments Referred to the JRA for Printing
- Filed for First Reading
- Read first time as amended in House; Filed for Second Reading
- Rules Suspended: Ayes 66 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 4, read in full as required – PASSED - 60-5-5
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Title apvd - to Senate
- Returned from House, amended
- Referred to 10th Order for possible concurrence
- Senate concurred in House amendments; referred to engrossment
On March 16, 2020 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Read First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration
- Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Title apvd - to House
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time in full – PASSED - 30-3-2
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported Printed; referred to Judiciary & Rules
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing
+ − Votes (2)
February 25, 2020: upper Vote
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 33
- Absent: 2
February 21, 2020: upper Vote
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 31
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsor
JUDICIARY
Type:
Primary Sponsor