+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor on 03/09/20 Session Law Chapter 79 Effective: 03/09/2020
- Reported delivered to Governor at 12:02 p.m. on 03/09/20
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
On March 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Title apvd - to Senate
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Read Third Time in Full – PASSED - 44-23-3
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 2, 2020
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- Read First Time, Filed for Second Reading
- Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Title apvd - to House
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time in full – PASSED - 32-1-2
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported Printed; referred to Finance
On February 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing
+ − Votes (2)
March 4, 2020: upper Vote
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 67
- Absent: 3
February 20, 2020: upper Vote
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 33
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
FINANCE COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor