+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor on 03/19/18 Session Law Chapter 148 Effective: 07/01/2018
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported delivered to Governor at 11:50 a.m. on 03/14/18
- Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
- Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read First Time, Filed for Second Reading
- Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported Printed; referred to Finance
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing
+ − Votes (2)
March 9, 2018: upper Vote
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 63
- Absent: 7
March 6, 2018: upper Vote
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 35
+ − Sponsor
FINANCE COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor