+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor on 03/22/16 Session Law Chapter 97 Effective: 07/01/2016
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported delivered to Governor at 11 a.m. on 03/16/16
- Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
- Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read Third Time in Full – PASSED - 64-0-6AYES – Anderson, Anderst, Andrus, Barbieri, Bateman, Bell, Beyeler, Boyle, Burtenshaw, Chaney, Cheatham, Chew, Clow, Collins, Crane, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Dixon, Gannon, Gestrin, Gibbs, Hartgen, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Kauffman, Kerby, King, Kloc, Loertscher, Luker, Malek, McCrostie, McDonald, McMillan, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Moyle, Nate, Nielsen, Nye, Packer, Palmer, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Redman, Romrell, Rubel, Rudolph, Rusche, Scott, Sims, Smith, Thompson, Troy, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Wills, Wintrow, Wood, Youngblood, Mr. SpeakerNAYS – NoneAbsent – Batt, Erpelding, Harris, Jordan, Shepherd, TrujilloFloor Sponsor - McDonaldTitle apvd - to Senate
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read First Time, Referred to Health & Welfare
- Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time in full – PASSED - 34-0-1AYES – Anthon, Bair, Bayer, Brackett, Buckner-Webb, Burgoyne, Davis, Den Hartog, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Harris, Heider, Hill, Johnson, Jordan, Keough, Lacey, Lakey, Lee, Lodge, Martin, McKenzie, Mortimer, Nonini, Nuxoll, Patrick, Rice, Siddoway, Souza, Stennett, Thayn, Vick, Ward-Engelking, WinderNAYS – NoneAbsent and excused – SchmidtFloor Sponsor - MartinTitle apvd - to House
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported Printed; referred to Health & Welfare
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing
+ − Sponsor
HEALTH
Type:
Primary Sponsor