+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor on 03/22/22 Session Law Chapter 123 Effective: 07/01/2022
- Reported delivered to Governor at 8:10 a.m. on 03/22/22
On March 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
- Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
On March 18, 2022 in the House:
- Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
On March 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Title apvd - to Senate
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- Read Third Time in Full – PASSED - 56-14-0
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- Read First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration
- Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
On February 25, 2022 in the House:
- Title apvd - to House
On February 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time in full – PASSED - 32-0-3
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported Printed; referred to Judiciary & Rules
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing
+ − Votes (2)
March 17, 2022: House Vote
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 14
Details:
+
−
- Vito Barbieri: Yea
- Judy Boyle: Yea
- Lance Clow: Yea
- Brent J. Crane: Nay
- John Gannon: Yea
- Terry Gestrin: Yea
- Marc Gibbs: Yea
- James Holtzclaw: Yea
- Wendy Horman: Yea
- Clark Kauffman: Yea
- Ron Mendive: Yea
- Jason A. Monks: Nay
- Mike Moyle: Nay
- John Vander Woude: Yea
- Fred Wood: Yea
- Rick D. Youngblood: Yea
- Greg Chaney: Yea
- Sue Chew: Yea
- Ryan Kerby: Yea
- John McCrostie: Yea
- Ilana Rubel: Yea
- Heather Scott: Yea
- Sage G. Dixon: Yea
- Caroline Nilsson Troy: Yea
- Paul Amador: Yea
- Randy Armstrong: Yea
- Megan Blanksma: Yea
- Gayann DeMordaunt: Nay
- Priscilla Giddings: Nay
- Karey Hanks: Nay
- Mike Kingsley: Nay
- Dustin Manwaring: Yea
- Dorothy Moon: Yea
- Scott Syme: Yea
- Kevin Andrus: Yea
- Steve Berch: Yea
- Chad Christensen: Yea
- Brooke Green: Yea
- Linda Wright Hartgen: Yea
- Laurie Lickley: Yea
- Tammy Nichols: Nay
- Tony Wisniewski: Yea
- Julianne Young: Nay
- Rod Furniss: Yea
- Lauren Necochea: Yea
- Jim Addis: Yea
- Ben Adams: Yea
- Matthew “Matt” Bundy: Yea
- David M. Cannon: Yea
- Marco Erickson: Yea
- Greg Ferch: Yea
- Codi Galloway: Yea
- Steven C. Harris: Yea
- Gary L. Marshall: Yea
- Chris Mathias: Yea
- Brandon Mitchell: Yea
- Colin Nash: Yea
- Ron Nate: Nay
- Doug Okuniewicz: Yea
- Joe A. Palmer: Nay
- James D. Ruchti: Yea
- Charlie Shepherd: Nay
- Bruce D. Skaug: Yea
- Sally J. Toone: Yea
- Jon O. Weber: Yea
- Julie Yamamoto: Yea
- Lori McCann: Yea
- Ned Burns: Yea
February 25, 2022: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 32
- Absent: 3
Details:
+
−
- Grant Burgoyne: Yea
- Janie Ward-Engelking: Yea
- Jim Guthrie: Yea
- Lee Heider: Yea
- Todd M. Lakey: Yea
- Patti Anne Lodge: Yea
- Fred S. Martin: Yea
- Jim Rice: Absent
- Michelle Stennett: Yea
- Steven P. Thayn: Yea
- Steve Vick: Absent
- Chuck Winder: Yea
- Mark Nye: Yea
- Melissa Wintrow: Yea
- Lori Den Hartog: Yea
- Abby Lee: Yea
- Van T. Burtenshaw: Yea
- Mark Harris: Yea
- Jeff Agenbroad: Yea
- Kelly Arthur Anthon: Yea
- Carl Crabtree: Yea
- Jim L. Patrick: Yea
- Christy Zito: Yea
- C. Scott Grow: Yea
- Doug Ricks: Yea
- Dave Lent: Yea
- David Nelson: Yea
- Jim Woodward: Yea
- Regina M. Bayer: Yea
- Kevin Cook: Yea
- Peter Riggs: Yea
- Carrie Semmelroth: Yea
+ − Sponsor
JUDICIARY
Type:
Primary Sponsor