+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- Read First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration
- Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Title apvd - to House
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time in full – PASSED - 35-0-0
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported Printed; referred to Judiciary & Rules
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing
+ − Vote
February 20, 2020: upper Vote
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 35
+ − Sponsor
JUDICIARY
Type:
Primary Sponsor