+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Became law without Governor’s signature on 03/21/18 Session Law Chapter 222 Effective: 07/01/2018
On March 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported delivered to Governor at 4:26 p.m. on 03/15/18
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
- Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
- Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs
- Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported Printed; referred to State Affairs
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing
+ − Votes (2)
March 13, 2018: upper Vote
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 69
- Absent: 1
March 2, 2018: upper Vote
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 35
+ − Sponsor
STATE AFFAIRS COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor