+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned from House Failed; to Secretary of Senate
- Order ret’d to Senate
On March 19, 2020 in the House:
- Read Third Time in Full – FAILED - 30-32-8
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On March 16, 2020 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Read First Time, Referred to Transportation & Defense
- Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Title apvd - to House
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time in full – PASSED - 28-7-0
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported Printed; referred to Transportation
On February 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing
+ − Votes (2)
March 19, 2020: upper Vote
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 32
- Present/NV: 62
- Absent: 8
February 24, 2020: upper Vote
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 35
+ − Sponsor
TRANSPORTATION COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor