+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Filed in Office of the Secretary of Senate
- Read third time in full – FAILED - 14-17-4
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported Printed; referred to Health & Welfare
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing
+ − Vote
February 23, 2022: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 17
- Absent: 4
Details:
+
−
- Grant Burgoyne: Yea
- Janie Ward-Engelking: Yea
- Jim Guthrie: Yea
- Lee Heider: Nay
- Todd M. Lakey: Nay
- Patti Anne Lodge: Nay
- Fred S. Martin: Absent
- Jim Rice: Nay
- Michelle Stennett: Yea
- Steven P. Thayn: Nay
- Steve Vick: Nay
- Chuck Winder: Yea
- Mark Nye: Yea
- Melissa Wintrow: Yea
- Lori Den Hartog: Nay
- Abby Lee: Absent
- Van T. Burtenshaw: Yea
- Mark Harris: Absent
- Jeff Agenbroad: Absent
- Kelly Arthur Anthon: Nay
- Carl Crabtree: Nay
- Jim L. Patrick: Yea
- Christy Zito: Nay
- C. Scott Grow: Nay
- Doug Ricks: Nay
- Dave Lent: Nay
- David Nelson: Yea
- Jim Woodward: Yea
- Regina M. Bayer: Nay
- Kevin Cook: Nay
- Peter Riggs: Yea
- Carrie Semmelroth: Yea
+ − Sponsor
HEALTH
Type:
Primary Sponsor