+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On March 13, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Read First Time, Referred to Education
- Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Title apvd - to House
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time in full – PASSED - 27-8-0
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Retained on calendar
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On February 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported Printed; referred to Education
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing
+ − Vote
February 19, 2020: upper Vote
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 35
+ − Sponsor
EDUCATION COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor