+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor on 03/20/18 Session Law Chapter 165 Effective: 07/01/2018
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported delivered to Governor at 11:35 a.m. on 03/15/18
- Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
- Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read First Time, Referred to Business
- Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported Printed; referred to Commerce & Human Resources
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing
+ − Votes (2)
March 12, 2018: upper Vote
- Yeas: 64
- Present/NV: 64
- Absent: 6
February 27, 2018: upper Vote
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 35
+ − Sponsor
COMMERCE
Type:
Primary Sponsor