+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor on 03/19/14
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported delivered to Governor on 03/14/14
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
- Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Read Third Time in Full - PASSED - 64-0-6
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
- Read First Time, Referred to Transportation & Defense
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time in full as amended - PASSED - 34-0-1
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time as amended, filed for Third reading
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read first time as amended, filed for Second Reading
- Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended
- Amendments reported printed
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Amendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment
- Reported out without recommendation, as amended
- Placed in the Committee of the Whole
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Printed; referred to Transportation
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
TRANSPORTATION COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor