+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor on 03/02/20 Session Law Chapter 33 Effective: 07/01/2020
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported delivered to Governor at 10:15 a.m. on 02/28/20
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Title apvd - to Senate
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Read Third Time in Full – PASSED - 68-0-2
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Read First Time, Referred to Commerce & Human Resources
- Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Title apvd - to House
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time in full – PASSED - 35-0-0
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported Printed; referred to Commerce & Human Resources
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing
+ − Votes (2)
February 24, 2020: upper Vote
- Yeas: 68
- Present/NV: 68
- Absent: 2
February 11, 2020: upper Vote
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 35
+ − Sponsor
COMMERCE
Type:
Primary Sponsor